+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 19
On April 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 4-15-2022
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Concurred in
On February 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 9:42 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to committee on Rules
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted by unanimous rising vote
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Cowles added as a coauthor
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
- Introduced by Senators Ballweg, Carpenter, Marklein and Testin; cosponsored by Representatives Petersen, Dittrich, Drake, Hintz, Krug, Macco, Murphy, Mursau, Sinicki, Thiesfeldt, Vos and Vruwink
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor