+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 5 offered by Senator Miller
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senator Darling
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 4 recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report passage as amended recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 3, Noes 0
- Available for scheduling
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Darling
- Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Darling
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Elections and Urban Affairs
- Introduced by Senators Darling, L. Taylor, Vukmir, Lazich and Farrow; cosponsored by Representatives Sanfelippo, Kooyenga, Hutton, Craig, Kuglitsch, Knodl, Stone, J. Ott, Honadel, Pridemore, Weatherston, Stroebel, Brooks, LeMahieu, Bernier and Tittl
+ − Amendments (5)
Senate Amendment 5
Senate Amendment 5 offered by Senator Miller
Senate Amendment 4
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 4 recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
Senate Amendment 3
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
Senate Amendment 2
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
Senate Amendment 1
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor