+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On July 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development
- Introduced by Senators Stroebel, Wanggaard, Nass and Jacque; cosponsored by Representatives Brooks, Skowronski and Tusler