+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
- Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-8-2022
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2022 by directive of the Majority Leader
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 59, Noes 36, Paired 2
- Representatives Steffen and Skowronski added as cosponsors
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 8:09 AM on 2-24-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 30
- Fiscal estimate received
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
- Received from Senate
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 21, Noes 12
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Carpenter, Smith, Agard and Ringhand
- Read a second time
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 12
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Executive action taken
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Ballweg added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Representative Allen added as a cosponsor
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Representative Murphy added as a cosponsor
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics
- Introduced by Senators Darling, Roth, Wimberger, Felzkowski, Nass and Stroebel; cosponsored by Representatives Knodl, Armstrong, Behnke, Brandtjen, Brooks, Cabral-Guevara, Dittrich, Gundrum, Horlacher, Krug, Kuglitsch, Magnafici, Penterman, Petersen, Pronschinske, Rozar, Sanfelippo, Schraa, Tittl, Wichgers and Neylon
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 24, 2022: Read a third time and concurred in, Paired 2
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 36
February 22, 2022: Senate Amendment 1 rejected
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 12
February 22, 2022: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 12
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor