+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Read a second time
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges, Ayes 5, Noes 4
- Executive action taken
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges
- Introduced by Senators Bernier, Darling, Ballweg and Felzkowski; cosponsored by Representatives Thiesfeldt, Kitchens and Wittke