+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Published 7-6-2013
- Report approved by the Governor on 7-5-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 32
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 7-3-2013
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 97, Noes 0
- Ordered immediately messaged
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 6-12-2013 by Committee on Rules
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on State and Local Finance, Ayes 8, Noes 0
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On May 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on State and Local Finance
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 2 adopted
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 5-7-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report introduction of Senate Amendment 2 by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Local Government
- Introduced by Senator Petrowski; cosponsored by Representatives Spiros and Wright
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 2
Senate Amendment 2 adopted
Senate Amendment 1
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski
+ − Votes (2)
June 12, 2013: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 97
May 7, 2013: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor