+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Dallman added as a cosponsor
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Ramthun added as a cosponsor
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Edming added as a cosponsor
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 8, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism
- Introduced by Senators Marklein, Bernier, Cowles, Feyen, Pfaff, Ringhand, Stafsholt, Testin, Wanggaard and Wimberger; cosponsored by Representatives Tranel, Armstrong, Brandtjen, Cabrera, Dittrich, Gundrum, Jagler, Kurtz, Moses, Murphy, Novak, Oldenburg, Petryk, Plumer, Pronschinske, Rozar, Skowronski, Summerfield, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt, Tusler, VanderMeer, Vruwink, Kerkman, Loudenbeck, Tittl and Born
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor