+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Published 3-27-2021
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-26-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 11
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-25-2021
- Report correctly enrolled
- LRB correction
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On March 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
- Ordered to a third reading
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representatives Steffen and Kurtz added as cosponsors
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 3-23-2021 by Committee on Rules
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
- Received from Senate
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 8, Noes 1
- Executive action taken
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Smith added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Edming added as a cosponsor
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism
- Introduced by Senators Marklein, Ballweg, Nass, Petrowski, Testin and Stroebel; cosponsored by Representatives Loudenbeck, Murphy, Novak, Tauchen, Tranel, VanderMeer, Oldenburg and Snyder
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor