+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs
- Introduced by Senator Marklein; cosponsored by Representatives E. Brooks, Bowen, Horlacher, Jacque, Kulp, Mursau, Spiros, Steffen, Subeck, Tranel, Tusler and Wichgers
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor