+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kapenga
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- LRB correction
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations
- Introduced by Senator Kapenga; cosponsored by Representative Ballweg, by request of Department of Safety and Professional Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor