+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2
- Executive action taken
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor
On November 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- Introduced by Senators Jacque, Wanggaard, Ballweg and Darling; cosponsored by Representatives Penterman, Brandtjen, Cabral-Guevara, Gundrum, Knodl, Murphy, Rozar, Wichgers and Edming
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor