+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Craig added as a coauthor
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations
- Introduced by Senators Kooyenga, Johnson, Stroebel, Olsen and Feyen; cosponsored by Representatives Quinn, Haywood, Considine, Kulp, Subeck, Steffen, Fields, Felzkowski, Stubbs, Knodl, Gundrum, Skowronski, VanderMeer, Magnafici, Katsma and Brostoff
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor