+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On November 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
- Introduced by Senators Felzkowski, Ballweg, Agard, Carpenter, Darling and Kooyenga; cosponsored by Representatives Kurtz, Brooks, Dittrich, Gundrum, Horlacher, Magnafici, Rozar, Skowronski, Tauchen, Tusler and Wichgers
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor