+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Olsen
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism
- Introduced by Senator Olsen; cosponsored by Representatives Ballweg, Born, Kremer, Kuglitsch and Tusler