+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Roth
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Roth
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues
- Introduced by Senators Roth, Risser, Olsen and Miller; cosponsored by Representatives R. Brooks, Sargent, Kahl, Kremer, Goyke, Gannon, Pope, Kolste, Hutton, Sinicki, Murphy and Genrich
+ − Amendments (2)
2015 SSA1-SB715
- Relating to: creating the Wisconsin Digital Property Act.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor