+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
- Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
On April 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-15-2022
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 60, Noes 36, Paired 2
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 9:50 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
- Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Executive action taken
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On November 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform
- Introduced by Senators Nass, Marklein, Stroebel, Bernier and Felzkowski; cosponsored by Representatives VanderMeer, Neylon, Magnafici, Allen, Cabral-Guevara, Dittrich, Horlacher, Knodl, Moses, Plumer, Sortwell, Thiesfeldt and Wichgers
+ − Vote
February 23, 2022: Read a third time and concurred in, Paired 2
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 36
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor