+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Fiscal estimate received
- Public hearing held
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges
- Introduced by Senators Darling and Tiffany; cosponsored by Representatives Quinn, E. Brooks, Tranel, Ballweg, Bernier, Czaja, Edming, Kitchens, Krug, Kulp, T. Larson, Mursau, Murtha, Nerison, Novak, Petryk, Ripp, Spiros, Swearingen, Tauchen, VanderMeer, Kremer, Jarchow, Macco, A. Ott, Skowronski and Vorpagel
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor