+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Published 3-29-2018
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 163
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2018
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action ordered immediately messaged
- Assembly Amendment 2 concurred in
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On November 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
On November 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Billings
- Assembly Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Jarchow
- Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Billings, Hebl, Hesselbein, Ohnstad, Pope and Sinicki
- Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 33
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 32
- Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representatives C. Taylor, Berceau, Billings, Brostoff, Doyle, Hebl, Hesselbein, Kessler, Meyers, Ohnstad, Sargent, Sinicki and Spreitzer
- Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 33
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 63, Noes 29, Paired 2
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a second time
On November 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jarchow
- Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules
On November 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Withdrawn from committee on Environment and Forestry and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Environment and Forestry
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 2 rejected
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
- Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Erpenbach
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 5-2-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Kapenga withdrawn as a coauthor
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 3, Noes 2
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Craig added as a coauthor
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry
- Introduced by Senators Moulton, Feyen, Marklein, Stroebel and Kapenga; cosponsored by Representatives Jarchow, Kleefisch, Neylon, Allen, E. Brooks, R. Brooks, Felzkowski, Gannon, Genrich, Horlacher, Kitchens, Knodl, Kooyenga, Kremer, Kulp, Mursau, Novak, Tittl and Tusler
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (4)
November 9, 2017: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 33
November 9, 2017: Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 32
November 9, 2017: Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 33
November 9, 2017: Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Paired 2
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 29
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor