+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-15-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 261
- Published 4-16-2022
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On January 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On January 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
On January 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 92, Noes 0
- Representative Hesselbein added as a cosponsor
- Ordered immediately messaged
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On December 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On November 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On November 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Swearingen added as a cosponsor
On November 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government
- Introduced by Senators Marklein, Darling, Ballweg, Bewley, Cowles, Petrowski and Felzkowski; cosponsored by Representatives Loudenbeck, Sortwell, Kurtz, James, Andraca, Armstrong, Conley, Dittrich, Duchow, Kerkman, Kuglitsch, Moses, Mursau, L. Myers, Spreitzer, Subeck, VanderMeer and Vruwink
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2022: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 92
January 25, 2022: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor