+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Published 4-4-2018
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 210
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 93, Noes 0
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
- Made a special order of business at 1:48 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business and Tourism, Ayes 8, Noes 0
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Small Business and Tourism
- Introduced by Senators Olsen, Marklein and Vinehout; cosponsored by Representatives Tauchen, VanderMeer, Born and E. Brooks
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2018: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 93
February 20, 2018: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 32