+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Elections and Utilities, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On October 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Representative Bernier added as a cosponsor
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Utilities
- Introduced by Senators Bewley and Ringhand; cosponsored by Representatives Subeck, E. Brooks, Ohnstad, Pope, Spreitzer, Sinicki, C. Taylor, Sargent, Berceau and Bowen
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor