+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs
- Introduced by Senators Risser, L. Taylor, Erpenbach, Ringhand and Larson; cosponsored by Representatives C. Taylor and Sinicki