+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Public hearing held
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- Introduced by Senators Tiffany, Craig, Darling, Olsen and Stroebel; cosponsored by Representatives Born, Nygren, R. Brooks, Tittl, Mursau, Rohrkaste, Spiros, Petersen, Ripp, VanderMeer, Kulp, Loudenbeck, Tauchen, Wichgers, Kooyenga, Felzkowski, Duchow, Krug, Kitchens, Hutton, Bernier, Ballweg and Edming
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor