+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Military Affairs and Senior Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Military Affairs and Senior Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Representative Vruwink added as a cosponsor
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Representative Barca added as a cosponsor
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development, Military Affairs and Senior Issues
- Introduced by Senators Stroebel, Testin, Miller, Darling, Roth and Vukmir; cosponsored by Representatives Duchow, Tauchen, Kuglitsch, Anderson, Kremer, Tusler, Kooyenga, Horlacher, Brandtjen, R. Brooks, Tranel, Thiesfeldt, Tittl, Kitchens, Jagler, Novak, VanderMeer, Ballweg, Rohrkaste, Knodl, Stafsholt, Ripp and Neylon
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor