+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Public hearing held
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Introduced by Senators Roth, Hansen, Cowles and Lasee; cosponsored by Representatives Steineke, Stuck, A. Ott, Rohrkaste, Schraa, Murphy and Hintz
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor