+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, by the Senate President, pursuant to Senate Rule 20(1)(c)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Craig
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Housing report received pursuant to 13.099 (2), Wisconsin Statutes
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On December 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade
- Introduced by Senators Lasee and Craig; cosponsored by Representatives R. Brooks, Schraa and Brandtjen
+ − Amendments (2)
2017 SSA1-SB639
- Relating to: the authority of political subdivisions to regulate rental properties and historic properties and of municipalities to inspect dwellings, public utility service to rental dwelling units, landlord and tenant regulations, fees imposed by a political subdivision, certain levy limit reductions, certain procedural changes in eviction actions, information available on the consolidated court automated Internet site, discrimination in housing against individuals who keep certain animals, falsely claiming an animal to be a service animal, municipal administrative procedure, enforcement of the rental unit energy efficiency program, and providing penalties.