+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges, Ayes 3, Noes 2
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Hansen and Bewley
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges
- Introduced by Senators Marklein, Gudex, Lasee, Moulton and Nass; cosponsored by Representatives Macco, Murphy, Bernier, Czaja, Duchow, Horlacher, Kitchens, Knodl, Kremer, Kulp, Mursau, A. Ott, Petryk, Quinn, Rodriguez and Tranel
+ − Amendment
2015 SSA1-SB622
- Relating to: the individual income tax subtract modification for tuition and student fees.
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor