+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On August 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representative Ballweg added as a cosponsor
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced by Senators Hansen, Bewley and Ringhand; cosponsored by Representatives Berceau, Bowen, Brostoff, Jacque, Ohnstad, Quinn and Sinicki
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor