+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 3, Noes 2
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On December 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Felzkowski
On November 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Murphy added as a cosponsor
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Gundrum added as a cosponsor
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On October 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Pronschinske added as a cosponsor
On October 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Schraa added as a cosponsor
On October 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Kurtz added as a cosponsor
On October 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- LRB correction
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry
- Introduced by Senators Felzkowski, Stafsholt, Bradley, Jacque, Jagler, Stroebel and Testin; cosponsored by Representatives Brooks, Dallman, Callahan, Allen, Brandtjen, Cabral-Guevara, Duchow, Edming, Horlacher, James, Knodl, Macco, Magnafici, Moses, Mursau, Penterman, Skowronski, Sortwell, Summerfield, Swearingen, Thiesfeldt, VanderMeer, Krug and Wichgers
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor