+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Representative Barca added as a cosponsor
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Feyen
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Feyen
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On November 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations
- Introduced by Senators Feyen, Darling, Bewley, Erpenbach and LeMahieu; cosponsored by Representatives Novak, Quinn, Vorpagel, Kooyenga, Petryk, Horlacher, Brostoff, Kitchens, Duchow and Tranel
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor