+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Published 3-12-2022
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-11-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 170
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 8:33 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On January 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On December 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On December 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On November 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
- Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor
On October 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government
- Introduced by Senators Cowles, Feyen and Stroebel; cosponsored by Representatives Dallman, Armstrong, Dittrich, Duchow, Kuglitsch, Mursau and Spiros
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor