+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On January 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On November 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs
- Introduced by Senators Hansen and Tiffany; cosponsored by Representatives Nygren and Mursau