+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On November 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Brooks added as a cosponsor
On October 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3
- Executive action taken
On October 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On September 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor
On September 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced by Senators Jagler, Nass and Darling; cosponsored by Representatives Dittrich, Kuglitsch, Cabral-Guevara, Rozar, Magnafici, Gundrum, Murphy, Penterman, Edming, Armstrong, Brandtjen, Tranel, Behnke and Knodl
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor