+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Published 4-9-2014
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 237
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up
On March 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
- Rules suspended
- Senator L. Taylor added as a coauthor
- Ordered immediately messaged
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Vinehout
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced by Senators Vukmir and Olsen; cosponsored by Representatives Rodriguez and Hutton
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment 1
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Vinehout
+ − Vote
March 11, 2014: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor