+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Partial veto placed on calendar 5-12-2020 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
- Failed to pass partial veto notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Published 3-4-2020
- Report approved by the Governor with partial veto on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 183
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- LRB correction
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
- Received from Senate
- Read
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 99, Noes 0
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 2 adopted
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Marklein
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On January 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
On November 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Introduced by Senators Marklein, Bernier and LeMahieu; cosponsored by Representatives Felzkowski, Swearingen, Edming, Katsma, Krug, Kulp, Kurtz, Milroy, Novak, Quinn, Snyder, Summerfield, Tranel, Tusler, Vorpagel and Wichgers
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 20, 2020: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 99
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor