+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Farrow
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Representative Ballweg added as a cosponsor
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges
- Introduced by Senator Farrow; cosponsored by Representatives Kuglitsch, Strachota, Knodl, Ripp, August, Craig, Pridemore, Kahl and Wright
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment 1
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges, Ayes 5, Noes 0
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor