+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On December 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On November 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions
- Introduced by Senators Testin, Schachtner, Smith and L. Taylor; cosponsored by Representatives Oldenburg, Spreitzer, Novak, Kolste, Tranel, Shankland, Bowen, Cabrera, Considine, Doyle, Emerson, Gruszynski, Kitchens, Krug, Kulp, Mursau, Neubauer, Ramthun, Schraa, Skowronski, Subeck, Summerfield, C. Taylor, Tusler, VanderMeer and Vruwink
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor