+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Representative Vining added as a cosponsor
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1
- Executive action taken
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative L. Myers added as a cosponsor
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Tranel added as a cosponsor
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senators Ballweg and Cowles added as coauthors
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection
- Introduced by Senators Stroebel and Roys; cosponsored by Representatives Tauchen, Dittrich, Doyle, Duchow, Hong, Krug, Kurtz, Macco, Milroy, Moses, Neubauer, Novak, Thiesfeldt and Wittke
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor