+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Published 4-17-2018
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 309
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 2:20 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On November 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 13
- Ordered immediately messaged
On November 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On November 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On October 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Craig added as a coauthor
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- Introduced by Senators Vukmir, Darling, Nass and Feyen; cosponsored by Representatives Sanfelippo, Kleefisch, Murphy, Duchow, Tusler, Gannon, Edming, Ott, Spiros, Allen, Kremer, Tittl, Skowronski and E. Brooks
+ − Vote
November 7, 2017: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 13
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor