+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Representative Felzkowski withdrawn as a cosponsor
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On November 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs
- Introduced by Senators Olsen, Darling, Erpenbach, Feyen, Miller, Moulton, Testin and Wanggaard; cosponsored by Representatives Ballweg, Barca, Considine, Felzkowski, Fields, Meyers, Mursau, Novak, Petryk, Rohrkaste, Sinicki, Thiesfeldt, Tittl, Wachs, Zepnick, Steffen and Tusler
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor