+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Representative Milroy withdrawn as a cosponsor
On December 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Snyder added as a cosponsor
On December 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On October 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families
- Introduced by Senators Olsen, Jacque, Darling and Cowles; cosponsored by Representatives Dittrich, Plumer, Ballweg, Felzkowski, James, Kerkman, Kulp, Magnafici, Milroy, Murphy, Mursau, Ramthun, Tusler, Born, VanderMeer and Edming
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor