+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Published 3-5-2022
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-4-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 149
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-3-2022
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On January 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
- Read a second time
- Referred to joint committee on Finance
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 93, Noes 0
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and taken up
On January 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules
On December 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On October 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 29, Noes 2
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On October 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On October 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor
- Placed on calendar 10-20-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On October 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On October 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On October 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles
On September 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Novak added as a cosponsor
On September 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Allen added as a cosponsor
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On August 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Introduced by Senators Cowles, Feyen, Petrowski, Bewley and Jacque; cosponsored by Representatives Armstrong, Tittl, Ramthun, Rozar, Ohnstad, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt, VanderMeer and Tusler
+ − Amendment
2021 SSA1-SB518
- Relating to: environmental pollution in an environmental remediation tax incremental district.
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2022: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 93
October 20, 2021: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor