+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On December 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On September 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On September 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On August 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges
- Introduced by Senators Wimberger, Carpenter, Marklein and Petrowski; cosponsored by Representatives Kitchens, Kurtz, Steffen, Cabral-Guevara, Duchow, Edming, Novak, Rozar, Skowronski, Tusler, VanderMeer, Wichgers, Ohnstad and Mursau
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor