+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Grothman
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Grothman
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications
- Introduced by Senator Grothman; cosponsored by Representatives Marklein, Kooyenga, Klenke, Kapenga and LeMahieu
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 2
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0
Senate Amendment 1
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor