+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Cowles and Moulton
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Executive action taken
On November 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On November 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Representative Edming added as a cosponsor
On October 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry
- Introduced by Senators Moulton, Harsdorf, Marklein, Stroebel and Tiffany; cosponsored by Representatives Quinn, Bernier, E. Brooks, Felzkowski, Kleefisch, Kulp, Petryk, Tauchen, Ripp and Summerfield
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor