+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Representative Milroy added as a cosponsor
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Representative Heaton added as a cosponsor
- Senator L. Taylor added as a coauthor
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Lassa added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- Introduced by Senators Olsen, Wanggaard, Darling, Erpenbach, Gudex, Harsdorf, Kapenga, Lasee, LeMahieu, Moulton, Roth, Shilling and Vukmir; cosponsored by Representatives Hutton, Kleefisch, Ballweg, E. Brooks, Brostoff, Czaja, Goyke, Horlacher, Jarchow, Johnson, Kahl, Knodl, Kooyenga, Murphy, Novak, Nygren, Schraa, Shankland, Skowronski, C. Taylor, Thiesfeldt and Ohnstad
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor