+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Tiffany
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tiffany
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry
- Introduced by Senators Tiffany and Gudex; cosponsored by Representatives Czaja, Horlacher, Murphy, Jarchow, T. Larson and Brandtjen
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor