+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 226
- Published 4-4-2018
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-13-2018 by Committee on Rules
On February 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On January 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Representative Barca added as a cosponsor
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Senator Hansen added as a coauthor
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read a third time and passed
- Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor
- Senator Nass added as a coauthor
- Ordered immediately messaged
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On December 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On October 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection
- Introduced by Senators Petrowski, Wanggaard, Bewley, Carpenter, Miller, Ringhand and L. Taylor; cosponsored by Representatives Mursau, Edming, Ballweg, Berceau, Considine, Genrich, Horlacher, Kolste, Milroy, Ohnstad, Skowronski, Spiros, Spreitzer, Subeck, C. Taylor and Tusler
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor