+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Published 3-2-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-1-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 245
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 2:29 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
On February 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Government Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On December 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Government Reform
- Introduced by Senator Nass; cosponsored by Representatives August, E. Brooks, Thiesfeldt, A. Ott and Tittl