+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On December 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On October 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations
- Introduced by Senators Petrowski and Feyen; cosponsored by Representatives Snyder, Mursau and Pronschinske